There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for an increase, effective December 1, 2014, in the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-181. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/18/2014Presented to President.
09/16/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7587)
09/11/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5571)
09/11/2014Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5570-5571)
04/28/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-181. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/18/2014SenatePresented to President.
09/16/2014-7:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2014-7:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7587)
09/16/2014-7:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2258.
09/16/2014-7:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7587-7588)
09/16/2014-7:44pmHouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2014-6:23pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/15/2014-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/11/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5571)
09/11/2014SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5570-5571)
04/28/2014SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/28/2014 Referred to
09/11/2014 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2258. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-181 (09/26/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2014, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.