Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/04/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/28/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/05/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/18/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/25/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/24/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/10/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/16/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/20/2014