Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/01/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/01/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/05/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/05/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/20/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2014