There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the medical center of the Department of Veterans Affairs located at 3900 Woodland Avenue in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, as the "Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-230. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014Presented to President.
12/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8857)
12/03/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6305)
12/03/2014Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6305)
02/07/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-230. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2014-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2014-4:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8857)
12/08/2014-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 229.
12/08/2014-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8857-8859)
12/08/2014-4:33pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/04/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/04/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2014-12:25pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/03/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6305)
12/03/2014SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6305)
05/09/2013SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
02/07/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/07/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/07/2013 Referred to
05/09/2013 Hearings by
12/03/2014 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs12/04/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-230 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Act of 2013 - Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical center at 3900 Woodland Avenue in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, as the "Corporal Michael J. Crescenz Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center."