Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/07/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/08/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/08/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/14/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/14/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/15/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/20/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/03/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/03/2014