There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Commission on the Future of the Army Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the National Commission on the Future of the Army, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/07/2014Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2785-2786)
Action By: Senate
05/06/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/07/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/07/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/07/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/07/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/07/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/08/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/08/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/12/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/12/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/13/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/13/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/14/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/14/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/15/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/15/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/15/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/21/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/21/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/21/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/21/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/21/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/22/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/12/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/17/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services05/06/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2295. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/06/2014)

National Commission on the Future of the Army Act of 2014 - Prohibits the use of funds made available for FY2015 for the Army to: (1) reduce Army personnel below the authorized fiscal year end strengths of 450,000 for active duty personnel of the Army, 345,000 for the Army National Guard, and 195,000 for the Army Reserve; or (2) divest, retire, or transfer any AH-64 Apache aircraft assigned to units of the Army National Guard as of January 15, 2014, or to reduce related personnel below the levels of such personnel as of September 30, 2014.

Directs the Secretary of the Army to ensure the continuing readiness of the AH-64 Apache aircraft and crews during FY2015.

Permits the use of such funds, after the Commission established by this Act submits its interim report, to prepare for the transfer of not more than 72 AH-64 Apache aircraft from the Army National Guard to the regular Army if the Secretary of Defense (DOD) certifies that such a transfer would not: (1) degrade the strategic depth or regeneration capacities of the Army, (2) degrade the Army National Guard in its role as the combat reserve of the Army, and (3) occur before October 1, 2014.

Establishes the National Commission on the Future of the Army, which shall: (1) undertake a comprehensive study of the structure of the Army and policy assumptions related to its size and force mixture in order to make recommendations on how the structure should be modified to best fulfill mission requirements in a manner consistent with available resources, and (2) submit a final report to the President and the congressional defense committees by February 1, 2016. Directs the Commission to study and submit an interim report on the feasibility and advisability of a partial transfer of Army National Guard AH-64 Apache aircraft from the Army National Guard to the regular Army.