Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/06/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/07/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/07/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/07/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/07/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/07/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/08/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/08/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/12/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/12/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/12/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/13/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/13/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/14/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/14/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/15/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/15/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/15/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/21/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/21/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/21/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/21/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/21/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/22/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/12/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/17/2014