Refine your search

3 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/01/2014 By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266.
08/26/2014 Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/07/2014 Introduced in Senate