There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Native American Languages Reauthorization Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to reauthorize a provision to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/01/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266.
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
05/07/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
10/01/2014By Senator Tester from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/18/2014. Report No. 113-266.
Action By: Senate
08/26/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
Action By: Senate
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
07/30/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/18/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-510.
05/07/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate
05/07/2014Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2797-2798)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs05/07/2014 Referred to
06/18/2014 Hearings by
07/30/2014 Markup by
08/26/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-266

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2299. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/26/2014)

Native American Languages Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to reauthorize through FY2019 and revise a grant program administered by the Administration for Native Americans at the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages.

Decreases the required minimum number of enrollees in educational programs funded by the grant program from:

  • 10 to 5 enrollees in Native American language nests, and
  • 15 to 10 enrollees in the Native American language survival schools.

Changes the duration of grants provided under the program.