There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate as wilderness certain land and inland water within the Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore in the State of Michigan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/13/2014Became Public Law No: 113-87. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2014Signed by President.
03/06/2014Presented to President.
03/04/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2125)
06/19/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4717)
04/22/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-14.
01/22/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
03/13/2014Became Public Law No: 113-87. (TXT | PDF)
03/13/2014Signed by President.
03/06/2014SenatePresented to President.
03/04/2014-5:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2125)
03/04/2014-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 23.
03/04/2014-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2125-2126)
03/04/2014-5:00pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/21/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/20/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/20/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/20/2013-2:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/19/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4717)
04/22/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 45.
04/22/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-14.
03/14/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/22/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/22/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/22/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/22/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-14
House Natural Resources06/20/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/21/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-87 (03/13/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore Conservation and Recreation Act - Designates specified land and inland water within the Sleeping Bear Dunes National Lakeshore in Michigan, to be known as the Sleeping Bear Dunes Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Requires the boundary of the Wilderness to be: (1) 100 feet from the centerline of adjacent county roads, and (2) 300 feet from the centerline of adjacent state highways.

Specifies this Act's effect on: (1) the maintenance and improvement of roads located outside the boundary of the Wilderness; (2) Michigan's jurisdiction with respect to the management of fish and wildlife, including hunting and fishing, within the National Lakeshore; and (3) any treaty rights or any existing valid private property rights.