Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/15/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/16/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/10/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/10/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/22/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/29/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/30/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/20/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/11/2014