Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/08/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/14/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/14/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/14/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/21/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew