Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/07/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 05/07/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/08/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/12/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/21/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/23/2014