There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security and Marriage Equality Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the method by which the Social Security Administration determines the validity of marriages under title II of the Social Security Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/08/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/13/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/15/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/21/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/08/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2305. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/08/2014)

Social Security and Marriage Equality Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act with respect to the determination of a valid marriage to account for marriages in jurisdictions other than a state.

Authorizes the courts of any state to find that an OASDI benefit applicant and an insured individual were validly married in a jurisdiction other than a state at the time the applicant files a benefit application or, if the insured individual is dead, at the time the individual died.