Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/08/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/13/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/15/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/21/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/12/2014