There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
09/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-165. (TXT | PDF)
09/19/2014Signed by President.
09/10/2014Presented to President.
09/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7249)
07/31/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5315; text as passed Senate: CR 8/1/2014 S5315)
07/31/2014Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-235.
02/07/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-165. (TXT | PDF)
09/19/2014Signed by President.
09/10/2014SenatePresented to President.
09/08/2014-2:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/08/2014-2:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7249)
09/08/2014-2:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 231.
09/08/2014-2:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7249)
09/08/2014-2:13pmHouseMr. Collins (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/05/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/01/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/01/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/01/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2014-10:52amHouseReceived in the House.
07/31/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/1/2014 S5315; text as passed Senate: CR 8/1/2014 S5315)
07/31/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 503.
07/31/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-235.
06/25/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/10/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/25/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/23/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/05/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/31/2014

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/07/2013 Referred to
06/25/2014 Markup by
07/31/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-235
House Oversight and Government Reform08/01/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources08/01/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs08/05/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.231.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-165 (09/19/2014)


(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Reauthorization Act of 2013 - Amends the Multinational Species Conservation Funds Semipostal Stamp Act of 2010 to require such stamp to be made available to the public for an additional four years.