Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/11/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/11/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/19/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/22/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 04/15/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 04/17/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/06/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/06/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/18/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/10/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/16/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/02/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/25/2014