There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Hezbollah International Financing Prevention Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prevent Hezbollah from gaining access to international financial and other institutions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/13/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/22/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/22/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/22/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/22/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/02/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/02/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/02/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/04/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/04/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/04/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/09/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/09/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/12/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/12/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/12/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/16/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/25/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/26/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2014
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/07/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/07/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/10/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/15/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/16/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/16/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 07/21/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/23/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/28/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/29/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/30/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/31/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/31/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/11/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/18/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/13/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2329. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/13/2014)

Hezbollah International Financing Prevention Act of 2014 - Declares that it shall be U.S. policy to: (1) prevent Hezbollah's global logistics and financial network from operating in order to curtail funding of its domestic and international activities; and (2) utilize diplomatic, legislative, and executive avenues to combat Hezbollah's criminal activities in order to block that organization's ability to fund its global terrorist activities.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to prohibit, or impose strict conditions on, the opening or maintaining in the United States of a correspondent account or a payable-through account by a foreign financial institution that knowingly: (1) facilitates the activities of Hezbollah or any of its agents or affiliates whose property or property interests are blocked pursuant to the International Emergency Economic Powers Act; (2) facilitates the activities of a person acting on behalf of or at the direction of, or owned or controlled by such institution; (3) engages in money laundering to carry out such activity; or (4) facilitates a significant transaction or transactions or provides significant financial services to carry out such activity.

Directs the Secretary to prescribe reporting, information sharing, and due diligence requirements for domestic financial institutions that maintain a correspondent account or payable-through account in the United States for a foreign financial institution.

Authorizes the Secretary to waive such requirements if in U.S. national security interests, and with congressional notification.

Directs the Secretary to identify to Congress every 180 days each foreign central bank that carries out an activity prohibited under this Act.

Sets forth penalty requirements for specified violations under this Act.

Directs the President to report to Congress regarding: (1) satellite, broadcast, Internet, or other providers that knowingly carry al-Manar TV or its affiliates; and (2) countries in which Hezbollah maintains important portions of its global logistics networks, and an assessment of whether a country is taking adequate measures to disrupt Hezbollah's networks within that country.

Directs the President to designate Hezbollah as: (1) a significant foreign narcotics trafficker if Hezbollah meets the criteria set forth under the Foreign Narcotics Kingpin Designation Act, and (2) a significant transnational criminal organization if Hezbollah meets the criteria set forth under Executive Order 13581.

Directs the President to report to Congress which of these criteria the President determines that Hezbollah has not met, if it does not.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall apply to authorized U.S. intelligence activities.

States that any requirement of this Act shall cease to be in effect 30 days after the President certifies to Congress that Hezbollah: (1) is no longer designated as a foreign terrorist organization, and (2) is no longer listed in the Annex to Executive Order 13224 (blocking property and prohibiting transactions with persons who commit or support terrorism).