Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/13/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/22/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/22/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/22/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/22/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/02/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/02/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/02/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/04/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/04/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/04/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/09/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/09/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/12/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/12/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/12/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/16/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/25/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/26/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2014
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/07/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/07/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/10/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/15/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/16/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/16/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 07/21/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/23/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/28/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/29/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/30/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/31/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/31/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/11/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/18/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/12/2014