Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/14/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/14/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/14/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/19/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/30/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/31/2014