Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 02/11/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/11/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/12/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/12/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/13/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/14/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/25/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/25/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/27/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/18/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/10/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/16/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/23/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/29/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/29/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/29/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/12/2014