Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/10/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/11/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/14/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/15/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/22/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/28/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2014