Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/15/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 05/15/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 05/15/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/15/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/20/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/21/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/05/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/23/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/26/2014