Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/20/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/20/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/20/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/20/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/22/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/22/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/10/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/16/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/23/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/25/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/26/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/10/2014