Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/09/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/23/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/14/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/21/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/17/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/18/2014