Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/21/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/21/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/21/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/02/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/09/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/12/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/21/2014