Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/22/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/22/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/22/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/19/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/23/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/29/2014