Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/03/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/04/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/04/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/05/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/09/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/26/2014