Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/09/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/16/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/16/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/26/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/26/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/26/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/26/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/26/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/26/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/26/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/07/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/08/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/21/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/22/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/24/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/24/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/29/2014