There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Harriet Tubman National Historical Park in Auburn, New York, and the Harriet Tubman Underground Railroad National Historical Park in Caroline, Dorchester, and Talbot Counties, Maryland, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/09/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4355-4364; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4357-4358; text as passed Senate: CR S4362-4363)
04/22/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment. With written report No. 113-23.
02/07/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/14/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/14/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/11/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/10/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/10/2014HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/10/2014-12:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/10/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/09/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4357-4358; text as passed Senate: CR S4362-4363)
04/22/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
04/22/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment. With written report No. 113-23.
03/14/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
02/07/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S523-524)
02/07/2013SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S522-523)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/07/2013

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/07/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/22/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-23
House Natural Resources07/10/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation07/14/2014 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs07/14/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/10/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/11/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.247. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/09/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on April 22, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Harriet Tubman National Historical Parks Act - Establishes in Caroline, Dorchester, and Talbot Counties, Maryland, the Harriet Tubman Underground Railroad National Historical Park as a unit of the National Park System.

Establishes in Auburn, New York, the Harriet Tubman National Historical Park also as a unit of the National Park System.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to enter into cooperative agreements with certain entities for the historical preservation and interpretation of the parks.

Requires the Secretary to complete a general management plan for the parks.

Amends the Water Resources Development Act of 1996 to decrease the federal share of project costs for navigation and safety improvements to the Chesapeake and Delaware Canal and Baltimore Harbor Connecting Channels in Delaware and Maryland.