Refine your search

Showing 23 of 23 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
11/27/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-55.
11/27/2013 Signed by President.
11/21/2013 Senate Presented to President.
Action By: Senate
11/18/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
11/14/2013 Senate Senate agreed to House amendments to Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8069)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
11/13/2013 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
11/12/2013-5:22pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:22pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6963)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:01pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 252.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:01pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6961-6967)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:01pm House Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
09/26/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/26/2013-10:01am House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 Senate Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR 9/24/2013 S6900-6901)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/25/2013 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR 9/24/2013 S6900-6901)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/14/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 13.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
02/14/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin without amendment. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
02/13/2013 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
02/07/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
02/07/2013 Senate Introduced in Senate
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate