Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/11/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/25/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/25/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/26/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/13/2013