There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

FOIA Improvement Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

FOIA Improvement Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

FOIA Improvement Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the Freedom of Information Act.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/08/2014 By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-287.
12/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6375-6377; text as passed Senate: CR S6375-6377)
11/20/2014 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/24/2014 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
12/09/2014-3:58pm House Held at the desk.
12/09/2014-12:22pm House Received in the House.
12/09/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
12/08/2014 Senate By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-287.
12/08/2014 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375-6377; text as passed Senate: CR S6375-6377)
11/20/2014 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605.
11/20/2014 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/20/2014 Senate Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/24/2014 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3942-3944)
06/24/2014 Senate Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3942)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/24/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/08/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/31/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/15/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/20/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/20/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/20/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/24/2014 Referred to
11/20/2014 Markup by
11/20/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-287

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (10)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Administrative remedies
  • Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
  • Congressional oversight
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Federal officials
  • Freedom of information
  • Government information and archives
  • Government studies and investigations

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on November 20, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

FOIA Improvement Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) to:

  • require federal agencies to make their disclosable records and documents available for public inspection in an electronic format;
  • require agencies to make available for inspection in an electronic format records that have been requested at least three times (frequently requested records);
  • prohibit an agency from charging a fee for providing records if the agency misses a deadline for complying with an FOIA request unless unusual circumstances apply;
  • prohibit an agency from withholding information requested under FOIA unless the agency reasonably foresees a specific identifiable harm to an interest protected by an FOIA exemption or disclosure is prohibited by law (presumption of openness);
  • require the Office of Government Information Services to offer mediation services to resolve disputes between agencies and FOIA requesters;
  • require the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to conduct audits of agency compliance with FOIA requirements;
  • expand the authority and duties of the Chief FOIA Officer of each agency for promoting compliance with FOIA disclosure requirements; and
  • establish a Chief FOIA Officers Council to develop recommendations for increasing compliance with FOIA requirements.

(Sec. 3) Requires the head of each federal agency to: (1) review agency regulations and issue regulations on procedures for disclosure of records in accordance with the amendments to FOIA made by this Act, and (2) include in such regulations procedures for engaging in dispute resolution through the FOIA Public Liaison and the Office of Government Information Services.

(Sec. 4) Expands the program for the efficient management of federal agency records to require agency heads to establish procedures for identifying records of general interest or use to the public that are appropriate for public disclosure and for posting such records in a publicly-accessible electronic format.

(Sec. 5) Prohibits the authorization of additional funds to carry out the requirements of this Act.