Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/09/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/10/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/10/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/14/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/15/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/16/2014