There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2014, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (28)

Date All Actions
07/31/2014Cloture motion on the bill rendered moot in Senate.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3754 SA 3754 fell when SA 3753 fell.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3753 SA 3753 fell when SA 3752 fell.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3752 SA 3752 fell when the motion to commit to Appropriations fell.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Appropriations with instructions that the committee report back forthwith with the following amendment (SA 3752) fell when the bill was referred to the Committee on Appropriations in Senate.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3751 SA 3751 fell when 3750 fell.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3750 SA 3750 fell when the bill was referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to section 312 of the Congressional Budget Act of 1974.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to the measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 44. Record Vote Number: 252.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Point of order against the measure raised in Senate.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3751 Motion to table amendment SA 3751 rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 52. Record Vote Number: 251.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Cloture motion on the bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S5197; text: CR S5197)
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3754 Amendment SA 3754 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3753. (consideration: CR S5197) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3753 Amendment SA 3753 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3752 (the instructions of the motion to commit). (consideration: CR S5197) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3752 Amendment SA 3752 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S5197) To change the enactment date.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Appropriations with instructions that the committee report back forthwith with the following amendment (SA 3752) made in Senate.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3751 Amendment SA 3751 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 3750. (consideration: CR S5197) Of a perfecting nature.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014S.Amdt.3750 Amendment SA 3750 proposed by Senator Reid. (consideration: CR S5197) To change the enactment date.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Measure laid before Senate by motion.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5159-5197, S5197-5206)
Action By: Senate
07/30/2014Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 33. Record Vote Number: 250. (consideration: CR S5083; text: CR S5083)
Action By: Senate
07/30/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5075, S5083-5085)
Action By: Senate
07/29/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5040-5042)
Action By: Senate
07/28/2014Cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S4988; text: CR S4988)
Action By: Senate
07/28/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S4988)
Action By: Senate
07/24/2014Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
Action By: Senate
07/23/2014Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Appropriations07/31/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2648.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2648. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/23/2014)

Emergency Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2014 - Appropriates supplemental funds for FY2014 to specified federal agencies and programs to respond to the increased apprehensions of unaccompanied children and minors along the southwestern border, fight wildfires, and support Israel's Iron Dome anti-missile defense system.

Provides appropriations for the Department of Justice (DOJ); the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), including U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE); the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS); and the Department of State to cover necessary expenses to respond to the significant rise in unaccompanied children and adults with children at the southwest border.

Provides appropriations for the U.S Department of Agriculture's (USDA's) Forest Service to cover anticipated wildfire suppression funding shortfalls if funds previously provided for wildfire suppression will be exhausted imminently and USDA notifies the appropriations committees of the need for additional funds.

Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 to require certain adjustments to discretionary spending limits for FY2015-FY2021 for wildfire suppression operations in the wildland fire management accounts at the Department of the Interior and the USDA.

Provides appropriations for the Department of Defense (DOD) to assist the government of Israel with procurement of the Iron Dome defense system to counter short-range rocket threats.

Designates funding provided in the Act as an emergency requirement pursuant to the Balanced Budget And Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985.

Specifies authorized, restricted, and prohibited uses of appropriated funds.