Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/11/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/11/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/08/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/10/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 01/06/2014