Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/12/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/11/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/14/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/08/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/13/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/06/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/29/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/29/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/01/2014