There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

End Government Shutdowns Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 31, United States Code, to provide for automatic continuing resolutions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/22/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/22/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (22)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/23/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/24/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/24/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/28/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/28/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/28/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/30/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/30/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/30/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/04/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/28/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/29/2013
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/30/2013 01/31/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations01/22/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)

  • Appropriations
  • Executive agency funding and structure

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.29. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/22/2013)

End Government Shutdowns Act - Makes specified provisional (automatic) continuing appropriations in the event that any regular appropriation bill for a fiscal year is not enacted before the beginning of such fiscal year, or a joint resolution making continuing appropriations is not in effect. (Thus prevents a federal government shutdown.)