There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the State of Mississippi 2 parcels of surplus land within the boundary of the Natchez Trace Parkway, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/18/2013Became Public Law No: 113-35. (TXT | PDF)
09/18/2013Signed by President.
09/12/2013Presented to President.
09/10/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 453).(text: CR H5452)
09/10/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-191.
06/19/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4720-4721)
04/22/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-25.
02/13/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
09/18/2013Became Public Law No: 113-35. (TXT | PDF)
09/18/2013Signed by President.
09/12/2013SenatePresented to President.
09/10/2013-4:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 453). (text: CR H5452)
09/10/2013-4:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5458)
09/10/2013-1:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/10/2013-1:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 304.
09/10/2013-1:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5452-5453)
09/10/2013-1:06pmHouseMr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/10/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 138.
09/10/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-191.
07/24/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/24/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/24/2013HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
07/19/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
06/21/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/20/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/20/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/20/2013-2:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/19/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4720-4721)
04/22/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 56.
04/22/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-25.
03/14/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/13/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/13/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/13/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/22/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-25
House Natural Resources06/20/2013 Referred to
07/24/2013 Markup by
09/10/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-191
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/21/2013 Referred to
07/19/2013 Hearings by
07/24/2013 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.304.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-35 (09/18/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013 - Requires the Secretary of the Interior to convey to Mississippi, by quitclaim deed and without consideration, all interest of the United States in two parcels of identified land totaling approximately 67 acres.

Requires the deed of conveyance to the parcel of land located southeast of U.S. route 61/84, and which is commonly known as the bean field property, to reserve an easement to the United States that restricts the use of such parcel only to uses which are compatible with the Parkway.

Adjusts the boundary of the Parkway to exclude the conveyed land and provides for inclusion in the Parkway of the approximately 10 acres identified as the proposed addition.