Committees: S.304 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/13/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/22/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-25
House Natural Resources06/20/2013 Referred to
07/24/2013 Markup by
09/10/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-191
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/21/2013 Referred to
07/19/2013 Hearings by
07/24/2013 Discharged from