Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
05/30/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-108.
05/30/2014 Signed by President.
05/21/2014 Presented to President.
05/19/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4453-4454)
05/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3630-3631)
05/20/2013 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3629-3631)
02/13/2013 Introduced in Senate