Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/14/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/26/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/26/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/26/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/26/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/13/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/18/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/22/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/15/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/25/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/07/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/08/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/08/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/15/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/18/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/10/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/10/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/10/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/10/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 09/23/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/26/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/12/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/12/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/18/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/20/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/20/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/09/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/16/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/17/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/19/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/19/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 12/19/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 12/20/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/20/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/12/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/27/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/05/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/10/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/24/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/26/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/29/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/22/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/11/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/23/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/04/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 12/08/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 12/08/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/11/2014