Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/07/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/06/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/30/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/31/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/09/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/25/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/13/2014