Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/04/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/11/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/09/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/10/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/10/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/13/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/17/2014