Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/08/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/16/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/17/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/21/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/02/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/18/2014