Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/21/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-51.
11/21/2013 Signed by President.
11/14/2013 Presented to President.
11/12/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6968)
06/17/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4534)
05/21/2013 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/14/2013 Introduced in Senate