There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Short Titles as Introduced

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to establish safeguards and standards of quality for research and transplantation of organs infected with human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/21/2013Became Public Law No: 113-51. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2013Signed by President.
11/14/2013Presented to President.
11/12/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6968)
06/17/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4534)
05/21/2013Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/14/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
11/21/2013Became Public Law No: 113-51. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2013Signed by President.
11/14/2013SenatePresented to President.
11/12/2013-5:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6968)
11/12/2013-5:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 330.
11/12/2013-5:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6967-6971)
11/12/2013-5:22pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/15/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/21/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/18/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2013-12:34pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/18/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/17/2013SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4534)
06/17/2013SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
06/17/2013SenateS.Amdt.1315 Amendment SA 1315 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
06/17/2013SenateS.Amdt.1315 Amendment SA 1315 proposed by Senator King for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S4534; text: CR S4534) Of a perfecting nature.
06/17/2013SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4533-4534; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4533-4534)
05/21/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
05/21/2013SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
03/20/2013SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
02/14/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/14/2013 Referred to
03/20/2013 Markup by
05/21/2013 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce06/18/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/21/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary06/18/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.330. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-51 (11/21/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on June 17, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to repeal the requirement that the Organ Procurement and Transplantation Network adopt and use standards of quality for the acquisition and transportation of donated organs that include standards for preventing the acquisition of organs infected with the etiologic agent for acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS).

Replaces this requirement with authorization for the Network to adopt and use such standards with respect to organs infected with human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), provided that any such standards ensure that organs infected with HIV may be transplanted only into individuals who are: (1) infected with such virus before receiving such an organ; and (2) participating in clinical research approved by an institutional review board under the criteria, standards, and regulations regarding organs infected with HIV developed under this Act or, if participation in such research is no longer warranted, receiving a transplant under such standards and regulations.

Revises similarly the requirement that organ procurement organizations arrange for testing to prevent the acquisition of organs infected with the AIDS etiologic agent to require that they arrange for testing to identify organs infected with HIV.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop and publish guidelines for the conduct of research relating to transplantation of organs from HIV-infected donors.

Requires the Network to revise its standards of quality regarding HIV-infected organs and the Secretary to revise related regulations.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) review annually the results of scientific research in conjunction with the Network to determine whether they warrant revision of quality standards relating to donated HIV-infected organs and to the safety of transplantation of organs with a particular strain of HIV into a recipient with a different strain; and (2) direct the Network, if the review so warrants, to revise its standards in a way that ensures the changes will not reduce the safety of organ transplantation.

Amends the federal criminal code to declare that an organ donation does not violate the prohibition against a knowing organ donation by an HIV-infected individual if the donation is made in accordance with this Act.