Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/07/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/13/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/19/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/20/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/20/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/08/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/08/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/13/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/13/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/12/2013