Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/14/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/22/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/22/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/17/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/25/2013