There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to provide consistent and reliable authority for, and for the funding of, the land and water conservation fund to maximize the effectiveness of the fund for future generations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/14/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/26/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/26/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 02/26/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/26/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/26/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/26/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/26/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 02/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/07/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/12/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/22/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/08/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/10/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/25/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/29/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/26/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/15/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/16/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/27/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/24/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/31/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.338.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.338. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/14/2013)

Land and Water Conservation Authorization and Funding Act of 2013 - Amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to make permanent the authorization for the Land and Water Conservation Fund.

Makes monies covered into the Fund available for expenditure to carry out the purposes of the Act without further appropriation.

Requires not less than 1.5% of the annual authorized funding amount to be made available for projects that secure recreational public access to existing federal public land for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes.